NC H200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-18 - Ch. SL 2019-250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-18 - Ch. SL 2019-250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
2019 Storm Recovery/Var. Budget Corrections
Title
2019 Storm Recovery/Var. Budget Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - C RPT Adoption Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair (Y: 48 N: 53 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 and SCS (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - C RPT Adoption Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair (Y: 48 N: 53 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 and SCS (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Ch. SL 2019-250 | |
2019-11-18 | Signed by Gov. 11/18/2019 | |
2019-11-14 | Pres. To Gov. 11/14/2019 | |
2019-11-14 | Ratified | |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-11-14 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/14/2019 |
2019-11-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-11-13 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-11-13 | House | Conferees Changed |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-31 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-31 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub and S Amend |
2019-10-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-10-31 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-10-31 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub and S Amend |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/27/2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |