NC H2 | 2016 | Extra Session 1

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Ch. SL 2016-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

2016 US House of Representatives Primary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2016 US House of Representatives Primary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 75 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - A1 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 69 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-23 Ch. SL 2016-2
2016-02-23 Signed by Gov. 2/23/2016
2016-02-19 Pres. To Gov. 2/19/2016
2016-02-19 Ratified
2016-02-19HouseOrdered Enrolled
2016-02-19HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2016-02-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2016-02-19HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2016-02-19SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2016-02-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2016-02-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2016-02-19SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2016-02-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2016-02-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2016-02-19SenateRef To Com On Redistricting
2016-02-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2016-02-19SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2016-02-19HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2016-02-18HousePassed 3rd Reading
2016-02-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2016-02-18HouseAmend Failed A1
2016-02-18HouseAdded to Calendar
2016-02-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2016-02-18HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2016-02-18HouseRef To Com On Redistricting
2016-02-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2016-02-18HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015E1&BillID=H2&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015E1/Bills/House/HTML/H2v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015E1/Bills/House/HTML/H2v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015E1/Bills/House/HTML/H2v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015E1/Bills/House/HTML/H2v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015E1/Bills/House/HTML/H2v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015E1/Bills/House/HTML/H2v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015E1&sChamber=H&RCS=4
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015E1&sChamber=H&RCS=5
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015E1&sChamber=S&RCS=4
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015E1&sChamber=S&RCS=5
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015E1&sChamber=H&RCS=7

Bill Comments

feedback