NC H2 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ch. SL 2009-27
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ch. SL 2009-27
Summary
Prohibit Smoking in Certain Public Places.
Title
Prohibit Smoking in Certain Public Places.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Ch. SL 2009-27 | |
2009-05-19 | Signed By Gov. 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Pres. To Gov. 5/15/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Ratified | |
2009-05-13 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Amend Failed #3 | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-05-07 | Amend Failed #1 | |
2009-05-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Health Care | |
2009-05-05 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-30 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-06 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-04-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Amend Failed 6 | |
2009-04-02 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2009-04-01 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2009-04-01 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2009-04-01 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-03-26 | Postponed To 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Cal For 3/26/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-03-03 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-01-29 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-01-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-01-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S205 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H2 |