NC H199 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish Standards for Surgical Technology
Title
Establish Standards for Surgical Technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - A1 Murphy Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - A1 Murphy Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-03-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/09/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/13/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-28 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |