NC H191 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Occ. Lic./Amend Fee List Barber Examiners Bd
Title
Occ. Lic./Amend Fee List Barber Examiners Bd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-08-13 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-08-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/12/2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S623 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate