NC H189 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Ch. SL 2015-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Ch. SL 2015-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rockingham Co. School Bd
Title
Rockingham Co. School Bd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Ch. SL 2015-38 | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified | |
2015-05-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/27/2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-05-21 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/31/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | Ref To Com On Elections |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |