NC H1884 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend SEAA Board Membership
Title
Amend SEAA Board Membership
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] |
Rep. Ray Rapp [D] | Rep. Cullie Tarleton [D] | Rep. Joe Tolson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-06-16 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-14 | Postponed To 6/15/2010 | |
2010-06-10 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2010 | |
2010-06-10 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-08 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1323 (Same As) 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-109