NC H1824 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Coyote Controls
Title
Coyote Controls
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Jim Gulley [R] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] |
Rep. James Langdon [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Darrell McCormick [R] | Rep. Arthur Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-156 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-22 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2010-06-22 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Agriculture | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |