NC H1789 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Ch. Res 2010-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Ch. Res 2010-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Tryon's 125th Anniversary
Title
Honor Tryon's 125th Anniversary
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. David Guice [R] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] |
Rep. Garland Pierce [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Ch. Res 2010-10 | |
2010-06-17 | Ratified | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2010 | |
2010-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |