NC H177 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
DEQ Omnibus.-AB
Title
DEQ Omnibus.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Counties
Deq
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Environment
Erwin
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Government Employees
Grants
Harnett County
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Industrial Waste
Infrastructure
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Manufacturing
Municipalities
Personnel
Public
Recycling
Reporting
Solid Waste
State Employees
Stokes County
Utilities
Walnut Cove
Waste Management
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Deq
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Environment
Erwin
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Government Employees
Grants
Harnett County
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Industrial Waste
Infrastructure
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Manufacturing
Municipalities
Personnel
Public
Recycling
Reporting
Solid Waste
State Employees
Stokes County
Utilities
Walnut Cove
Waste Management
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
126 | 53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.05 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 309.204 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159G | 22 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159G | 36 | (n/a) | Citation Text |