NC H176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pensions Integrity Act of 2017.-AB
Title
Pensions Integrity Act of 2017.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ross [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] |
Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Ch. SL 2017-128 | |
2017-07-20 | Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-23 | House | Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2017-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |