NC H172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Samantha Rose Davis Act
Title
Samantha Rose Davis Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-28 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2023-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-08 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2023-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations; Boards; Budgeting; Colleges & Universities; Diseases & Health Disorders; Education; Education Administration; Education
State Board Of; Elementary Education; Health Education; Higher Education; Occupations; Professional Education; Public; Public Health; Public Instruction Dept.; Secondary Education; Session Laws; State Employees; Students; Teachers; Unc; Unc Board Of Gover
State Board Of; Elementary Education; Health Education; Higher Education; Occupations; Professional Education; Public; Public Health; Public Instruction Dept.; Secondary Education; Session Laws; State Employees; Students; Teachers; Unc; Unc Board Of Gover
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 218.75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 375.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 47 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 239.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text |