NC H1712 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend Credit for Oyster Shell Recycling
Title
Extend Credit for Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aquaculture, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1272 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Finance