NC H1696 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Reptd Unfav
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Reptd Unfav
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Watauga/Sunday Bow Hunting Exemption
Title
Watauga/Sunday Bow Hunting Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Reptd Unfav | |
2010-06-23 | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-06-23 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Wildlife Resources | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |