NC H1607 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Adjust B1-E Felony Penalties.
Title
Adjust B1-E Felony Penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-07 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S490 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - Ref To Com On Insurance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1607 |