NC H153 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Ch. SL 2012-193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Ch. SL 2012-193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
No Public Retirement for Convicted Felons
Title
No Public Retirement for Convicted Felons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - A3 Womble\Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - A2 Howard\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - A1 Howard\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - A3 Womble\Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - A2 Howard\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - A1 Howard\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Ch. SL 2012-193 | |
2012-07-17 | Signed By Gov. 7/17/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2012-06-27 | Re-ref Com On State Personnel | |
2012-06-27 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-26 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-26 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-26 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-20 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2011-04-19 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-07 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-06 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2011-04-06 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-04-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-04-04 | Postponed To 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Placed On Cal For 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-31 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-22 | Ref To Com On State Personnel | |
2011-02-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |