NC H1463 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expand Access/Confidential Intermediaries
Title
Expand Access/Confidential Intermediaries
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Dickson [D] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] | Rep. Ty Harrell [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Darren Jackson [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Winfrey Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-116 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-12 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-05-12 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 5/19/2010 | |
2009-08-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-16 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |