NC H141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Energy, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Promote North Carolina Sawmills

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promote North Carolina Sawmills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-15HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-14HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-13HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-25HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary 1
2021-03-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-24HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback