NC H14 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Summary
Chiropractic Services/Insurance.
Title
Chiropractic Services/Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-02 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H14 |