NC H136 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Finance
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Finance
Summary
DOT/Fiber-Optic Cable.
Title
DOT/Fiber-Optic Cable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2009-04-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Ways & Means / Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Transportation | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H136 |