NC H13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Ch. SL 2015-222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Ch. SL 2015-222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend School Health Assessment Requirement
Title
Amend School Health Assessment Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-12 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-30 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - A3 Glazier Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - A2 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-30 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - A3 Glazier Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - A2 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | Ch. SL 2015-222 | |
2015-08-18 | Signed by Gov. 8/18/2015 | |
2015-08-17 | Pres. To Gov. 08/17/2015 | |
2015-08-13 | Ratified | |
2015-08-12 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-08-12 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-08-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/12/2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/12/2015 |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-07-30 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-07-30 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-07-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-07-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-30 | House | Postponed To 08/03/2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-28 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-27 | Engrossed | |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Education/Higher Education |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-03-23 | House | Postponed To 03/24/2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Postponed To 03/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-03-18 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/18/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2015-03-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-01-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education - K-12 |
2015-01-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |