NC H1262 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-14)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-08 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-08 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suicide Prevention Resolution
Title
Suicide Prevention Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - House - A1 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - House - A1 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-07-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2014 |
2014-06-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-11 | House | Filed |