NC H118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Various Special License Plates
Title
Various Special License Plates
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. John Blust [R] |
Rep. John Ager [D] | Rep. Chaz Beasley [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. John Bradford [R] |
Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] |
Rep. David Rogers [R] | Rep. Scott Stone [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2017-06-15 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-05-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |