NC H1165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Salisbury Voluntary Annex Temp. Moratoria
Title
Salisbury Voluntary Annex Temp. Moratoria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Annexation
Counties
Extraterritoriality
Local
Local Government
Moratoriums
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Rowan County
Salisbury
Counties
Extraterritoriality
Local
Local Government
Moratoriums
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Rowan County
Salisbury