NC H1149 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Ch. Res 2016-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Ch. Res 2016-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirm Fred Steen/Board of Review
Title
Confirm Fred Steen/Board of Review
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Robert Reives [D] |
Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Ch. Res 2016-19 | |
2016-06-23 | Ratified | |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-06-16 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-14 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-14 | House | Filed |