NC H1107 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Status: Introduced on April 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Summary
Alimony and Post Separation Support Waiver.
Title
Alimony and Post Separation Support Waiver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-05 | Postponed To 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-16 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1107 |