NC H1096 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Ch. SL 2014-72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Ch. SL 2014-72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Union County/Contracted Ambulance Service
Title
Union County/Contracted Ambulance Service
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Ch. SL 2014-72 | |
2014-07-17 | Ratified | |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2014-06-04 | House | Regular Message sent to the Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-19 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2014-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Filed |