NC H1079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Ch. SL 2020-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Ch. SL 2020-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Sales Tax Changes
Title
Various Sales Tax Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Ch. SL 2020-6 | |
2020-06-05 | Signed by Gov. 6/5/2020 | |
2020-06-02 | Pres. To Gov. 6/2/2020 | |
2020-06-01 | Ratified | |
2020-05-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-05-28 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/28/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-05-27 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/26/2020 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-05-19 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-05-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-05-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S718 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate