NC H1077 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PPP Pilot Toll Project/Ferry Tolls
Title
PPP Pilot Toll Project/Ferry Tolls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | Ch. SL 2012-184 | |
2012-07-16 | Signed By Gov. 7/16/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-03 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-07-03 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2012-07-03 | Placed On Cal For 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-07-03 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2012-07-03 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-07-03 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-07-03 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-07-02 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-29 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-06-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-29 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-21 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2012-06-21 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-24 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Filed |