NC H1058 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ret. & Treasury Tech. Corrections Act of 2022.-AB
Title
Ret. & Treasury Tech. Corrections Act of 2022.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-16 | |
2022-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2022 | |
2022-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2022 | |
2022-06-27 | Ratified | |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Able Program Board
Boards
Chaptered
Cjrs
Commissions
Council Of State
Disabled Persons
Education
Funds & Accounts
Government Employees
Health Services
Judges
Lgers
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Local Government Employees
Magistrates
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
Social Services
State Employees
State Treasurer
Teachers
Tsers
Boards
Chaptered
Cjrs
Commissions
Council Of State
Disabled Persons
Education
Funds & Accounts
Government Employees
Health Services
Judges
Lgers
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Local Government Employees
Magistrates
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
Social Services
State Employees
State Treasurer
Teachers
Tsers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 4.27 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 24 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 27 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 5.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 60 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 166.60 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 86.70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 86.71 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 86.73 | (n/a) | Citation Text |