NC H1043 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ch. SL 2014-42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ch. SL 2014-42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prequalification Update
Title
Prequalification Update
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Ch. SL 2014-42 | |
2014-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2014 | |
2014-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2014 | |
2014-06-26 | Ratified | |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-25 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2014 |
2014-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-06-23 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-19 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2014-06-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/10/2014 |
2014-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S814 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I