NC H1035 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Performance & Payment Bond Modification
Title
Performance & Payment Bond Modification
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Daniel Goforth [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Marian McLawhorn [D] | Sen. Earline Parmon [D] | Rep. Douglas Yongue [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-148 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-08 | Ref To Com On Insurance | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-13 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-06 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Filed |