NC H102 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Permanent Rules
Title
House Permanent Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - A1 Autry R2 For Adoption (Y: 46 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A2 Butler R2 For Adoption (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A3 Harrison R2 For Adoption (Y: 49 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A4 Lofton R2 For Adoption (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A5 Lofton R2 For Adoption (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A6 Smith, Charles R2 For Adoption (Y: 47 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 76 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - A2 Butler R2 For Adoption (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A3 Harrison R2 For Adoption (Y: 49 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A4 Lofton R2 For Adoption (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A5 Lofton R2 For Adoption (Y: 48 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - A6 Smith, Charles R2 For Adoption (Y: 47 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 76 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Adopted |
2023-02-15 | House | Amend Failed A6 |
2023-02-15 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2023-02-15 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2023-02-15 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2023-02-15 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2023-02-15 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/15/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-02-14 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2023-02-14 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |