NC H1004 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Ch. SL 2022-17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Troutman Charter Revised & Consolidated
Title
Troutman Charter Revised & Consolidated
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Rep. Jake Johnson [R] | Rep. Grey Mills [R] |
Rep. Howard Penny [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Ch. SL 2022-17 | |
2022-06-29 | Ratified | |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Iredell County
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Municipalities
Ratified
Session Laws
Troutman
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Iredell County
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Municipalities
Ratified
Session Laws
Troutman