MT SR64 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirmation of appointees to the board of housing
Title
Confirmation of appointees to the board of housing
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sonju [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-04-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-04-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-04-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-04-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-04-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-04-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-04-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-04-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-04-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |