MT SR5 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-25 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-25 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State  
Summary
Confirm appointee to Board of Public Education
Title
Confirm appointee to Board of Public Education
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Laible [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | (S) Filed with Secretary of State   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Resolution Adopted   | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders   | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-06 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-06 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-02-06 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-02-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-28 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=5&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SR&Z_ACTION=Find |