MT SR34 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Governor's appointees to the Historical Society Board of Trustees
Title
Confirm Governor's appointees to the Historical Society Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-08 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |