MT SJ7 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Resolution opposing clean waters restoration act and navigable rivers
Title
Resolution opposing clean waters restoration act and navigable rivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | (S) Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-04 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-02 | (H) Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-02 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-02 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-01 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-09 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-01-27 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-01-08 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-01-08 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-07 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2010-12-30 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |