MT SJ38 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study impact of tribal colleges
Title
Study impact of tribal colleges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Education |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2013-04-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-04-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-04-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-04-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-04-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-04-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-04-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-04-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-04-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-04-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-04-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-02-02 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-19 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |