MT SJ33 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution recommending interim committee monitoring on fiscal matters
Title
Resolution recommending interim committee monitoring on fiscal matters
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ripley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-04-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-04-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-04-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-03-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |