MT SJ21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Summary
Study of eminent domain and just compensation for property
Title
Study of eminent domain and just compensation for property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Motion Failed | |
2011-04-18 | (H) 3rd Reading Failed | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-04-04 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-04-02 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-01 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-25 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-22 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-03-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-03-18 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2011-01-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |