MT SJ20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution requesting a legislative study on prescription drug abuse
Title
Resolution requesting a legislative study on prescription drug abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-17 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-03-16 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-02-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |