MT SJ12 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Study net metering laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study net metering laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27Senate(S) Filed with Secretary of State
2015-04-24House(H) Signed by Speaker
2015-04-24Senate(S) Signed by President
2015-04-24Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2015-04-24 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2015-04-23Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2015-04-22House(H) Returned to Senate
2015-04-22House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2015-04-22House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-04-21House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2015-04-21House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-04-20House(H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process
2015-04-20House(H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
2015-04-20House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-03-28House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications
2015-03-27House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications
2015-03-23House(H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications
2015-03-10House(H) First Reading
2015-03-10House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications
2015-03-06Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2015-03-06Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2015-03-06Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-03-05Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2015-03-05Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-02-18 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-02-18Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2015-02-17Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2015-02-17Senate(S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2015-02-12Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2015-02-12Senate(S) First Reading
2015-02-11 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-02-11Senate(S) Introduced
2015-02-10 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-02-10 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-02-09 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-02-09 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-02-09 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-02-09 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-02-06 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2015-02-05 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-02-04 (C) Draft On Hold
2015-02-03 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-12-08 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-11-20 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=12&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SJ&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/senjoint/SJ0012_1.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/senjoint/SJ0012_2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/senjoint/SJ0012_x.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S803&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S834&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1911&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1930&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1942&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2003&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/house/votesheets/SJ0012FEH150327.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/senate/votesheets/SJ0012ENS150217.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback