MT SB95 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise notary stamp requirements
Title
Revise notary stamp requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Signed by Governor | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-09 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government | |
2011-02-01 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-01-18 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-17 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-01-13 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-01-03 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government | |
2010-12-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-29 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-12-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-11-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-11-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-04-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |