MT SB81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extend deadline to correct an application for water right permit or change

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend deadline to correct an application for water right permit or change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31House(H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources
2019-01-31House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources
2019-01-29Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2019-01-29Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2019-01-29Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-01-28Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-01-28Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-01-24Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources
2019-01-23Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources
2019-01-18Senate(S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources
2019-01-07Senate(S) First Reading
2018-12-21Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources
2018-12-15 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2018-12-15Senate(S) Introduced
2018-12-14 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-11-30 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-11-29 (C) Draft in Assembly
2018-11-29 (C) Executive Director Review
2018-11-29 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2018-11-29 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2018-11-26 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2018-11-26 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2018-11-21 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-11-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-11-20 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-09-19 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback