MT SB8 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow electronic prescribing of controlled substances prescriptions
Title
Allow electronic prescribing of controlled substances prescriptions
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-28 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services |
2015-03-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2014-11-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-11-17 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-10-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-10-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-10-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-10-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-09-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2014-09-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-09-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-08-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |