MT SB78 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise reimbursement of net metered generators
Title
Revise reimbursement of net metered generators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |