MT SB72 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Create presumptive illness for firefighters
Title
Create presumptive illness for firefighters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-30 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-16 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-05 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-04-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Fires and Fire Protection
Fish and Wildlife
Insurance
Money Transfer
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Workers' Compensation
Fish and Wildlife
Insurance
Money Transfer
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Workers' Compensation