MT SB71 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Regulate health insurers' administration of pharmacy benefits for consumers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulate health insurers' administration of pharmacy benefits for consumers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Senate(S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
2019-05-13Senate(S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress
2019-05-09Senate(S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared
2019-05-09Senate(S) Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-29Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-26House(H) Signed by Speaker
2019-04-26Senate(S) Signed by President
2019-04-09 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2019-04-08Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2019-04-05Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2019-04-04House(H) Returned to Senate
2019-04-04House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2019-04-04House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-04-03House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2019-04-03House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2019-04-03House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-03-25House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor
2019-03-25House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor
2019-03-22House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2019-02-28House(H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor
2019-02-28House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2019-02-27Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2019-02-27Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2019-02-27Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-02-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-02-27Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-02-22Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims
2019-02-22Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims
2019-02-19Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2019-02-15 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2019-02-14Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2019-02-14Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2019-02-14Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2019-02-02Senate(S) Sponsor List Modified
2019-02-01Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2019-01-11Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2019-01-10Senate(S) Fiscal Note Signed
2019-01-09Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2019-01-07Senate(S) First Reading
2018-12-21Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2018-12-18Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2018-12-14 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2018-12-14Senate(S) Introduced
2018-12-11 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Assembly
2018-12-11 (C) Executive Director Review
2018-12-11 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2018-12-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2018-12-10 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2018-12-10 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2018-12-07 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-12-06 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-12-04 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-09-06 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=71&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/SB0099/SB0071_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/SB0099/SB0071_2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/senate/votesheets/SB0071BUS190214.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/senate/votesheets/SB0071FCS190222.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S651&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S671&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/house/votesheets/SB0071BUH190325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1460&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1512&P_SESS=20191

Bill Comments

feedback