MT SB58 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the Montana Bank Act
Title
Revise the Montana Bank Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-03-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2018-12-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-12-12 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-09-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |